Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 123 Today
» 843 Yesterday
» 2706 Week
» 19655 Month
» 133916 Year
» 1018297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4053 28/01/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 28/01/1961
Withdrawn 31/12/1971
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 28/01/1961
41J Langwith Junction w/e 15/12/1962
41J Shirebrook 4w/e 31/10/1966
40B Immingham w/e 26/07/1969
   Withdrawn 31/12/1971

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
28/01/1961 Power Unit 60J332    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/01/1961 To Service To service as D4053
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
31/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
26/07/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
31/12/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D4053    
01/08/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev