Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 21980 Month
» 217434 Year
» 1101815 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4055 08/02/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/02/1961
Withdrawn 31/12/1971
Time in Service 10 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 08/02/1961
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
36A Doncaster w/e 06/11/1965
   Withdrawn 31/12/1971

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/02/1961 Power Unit 60M166    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/02/1961 To Service To service as D4055
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
31/12/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as D4055    
01/04/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev