Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 944 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5075 Week
» 15245 Month
» 293041 Year
» 1177422 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4057 18/02/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/02/1961
Withdrawn 21/01/1972
Time in Service 10 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 18/02/1961
41J Langwith Junction w/e 15/12/1962
41J Shirebrook 4w/e 31/10/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 23/08/1969
41J Shirebrook w/e 26/12/1970
   Withdrawn 21/01/1972

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
18/02/1961 Power Unit 60L36    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/02/1961 To Service To service as D4057
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
31/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
23/08/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
26/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J)    
21/01/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D4057    
01/09/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev