Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 899 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18702 Week
» 71718 Month
» 191245 Year
» 3218098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D406 |
28/03/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50006 |
09/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Neptune |
25/09/1979 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D406 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50006 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
25/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
07/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
25/09/1979 |
Naming |
Named 'Neptune' at Doncaster Works |
|
|
16/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50006 |
|
|
03/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|