Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1545 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19348 Week
» 72364 Month
» 191891 Year
» 3218744 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
318 |
m/e |
02/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8428 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28428 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
British Railways |
58377 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Cauliflowers |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3639 |
To Service |
During 02/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/06/1952 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 318 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3639 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8428 |
|
|
11/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28428 |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58377 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58377 |
|
|