Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1531 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15574 Week
» 80528 Month
» 283192 Year
» 3310045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1780 |
m/e |
05/1899 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8492 |
m/e |
04/1928 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28492 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
British Railways |
58389 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Cauliflowers |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3927 |
To Service |
During 05/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/02/1953 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1899 |
5D |
|
Stoke |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
5D |
|
Stoke |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
5A |
|
Crewe North |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
5A |
Crewe North |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/02/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1899 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1780 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3927 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8492 |
|
|
12/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28492 |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58389 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
07/02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58389 |
|
|