Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1482 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14888 Week
» 67904 Month
» 187431 Year
» 3214284 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
51 |
m/e |
02/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8515 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28515 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
British Railways |
58398 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 51 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4009 |
|
|
01/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8515 |
|
|
10/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28515 |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58398 |
|
|
27/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58398 |
|
|