Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2999 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16405 Week
» 69421 Month
» 188948 Year
» 3215801 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
121 |
m/e |
03/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8525 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28525 |
m/e |
11/1943 |
British Railways |
58400 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 121 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4019 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8525 |
|
|
11/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28525 |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58400 |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58400 |
|
|