Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1113 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14519 Week
» 67535 Month
» 187062 Year
» 3213915 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
458 |
m/e |
11/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8559 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28559 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
British Railways |
58415 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 458 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4086 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8559 |
|
|
12/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28559 |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
27/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58415 |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58415 |
|
|