Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1424 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15467 Week
» 80421 Month
» 283085 Year
» 3309938 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
547 |
m/e |
02/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8585 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28585 |
m/e |
11/1942 |
British Railways |
58420 |
m/e |
Not applied |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
21/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 547 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4121 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8585 |
|
|
11/1942 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28585 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 58420 but not taken up |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
23/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 28585 |
|
|