Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 920 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18723 Week
» 71739 Month
» 191266 Year
» 3218119 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2070 |
m/e |
05/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1924) |
8622 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (Dup.) |
28622 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
British Railways |
58430 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
Cauliflowers |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
4223 |
To Service |
During 05/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/03/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1902 |
12D |
|
Workington |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
8D |
|
Widnes |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/03/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
12D |
Workington |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/03/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/10/1945 |
Swansea Paxton Street MPD |
Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2070 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4223 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8622 |
|
|
05/1943 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 28622 |
|
|
17/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 58430 |
|
|
12/03/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 58430 |
|
|