Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 4 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5348 Week
» 6238 Month
» 314219 Year
» 1198600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2431   06/1881
LNWR (Dup) 3427   12/1916
LMS (1923) 8239   09/1926
LMS (Dup) 28239   07/1940
BR 58346   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Engines
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 2468
To Service During 06/1881
Withdrawal During 03/1952
Service Life 70 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 29/02/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 13/11/1948
LOAN 84G Shrewsbury w/e 02/02/1952
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   w/e 01/03/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev