Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 713 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4261 Week
» 5151 Month
» 313132 Year
» 1197513 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 2443   07/1882
LNWR (Dup) 3099   01/1914
LMS (1923) 8247   04/1927
LMS (Dup) 28247   07/1940
BR 58349   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Webb
Class Coal Engines
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 2546
To Service During 07/1882
Withdrawal During 01/1951
Service Life 68 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3B Bushbury w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 09/10/1948
WDN   w/e 20/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev