Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 407 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18210 Week
» 71226 Month
» 190753 Year
» 3217606 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4064 |
07/04/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/04/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
07/04/1961 |
Power Unit 60M286 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4064 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4064 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|