Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3284 Week
» 13454 Month
» 291250 Year
» 1175631 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4069 25/05/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/05/1961
Withdrawn 23/04/1972
Time in Service 10 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1985
Cut At National Coal Board (Whittle Colliery)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 25/05/1961
41J Langwith Junction w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn 23/04/1972

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
25/05/1961 Power Unit 61A256    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/05/1961 To Service To service as D4069
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/04/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D4069    
01/12/1985 Scrapped Broken up by National Coal Board: Whittle Colliery    

prev prev