Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 402 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1364 Week
» 18164 Month
» 334395 Year
» 845497 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D407 12/03/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50007 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Hercules (removed 05/02/1984) 06/04/1978
SIR EDWARD ELGAR 25/04/1984

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 12/03/1968
Withdrawn 31/03/1994
Withdrawal Reason Surplus to requirements
Time in Service 26 yrs , 19 dys
Cut Up 03/05/1994
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 12/03/1968
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
LA Laira w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn 31/03/1994

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/03/1968 To Service To service as D407
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
   
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
13/07/1969 Sightings Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969 Link
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50007    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
06/04/1978 Naming Named 'Hercules' at Laira    
25/04/1984 Naming Renamed 'SIR EDWARD ELGAR' by Simon Rattle at Paddington Station    
31/03/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 50007    

prev prev