Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 141 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 141 Week
» 21982 Month
» 217436 Year
» 1101817 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4073 05/08/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/08/1961
Withdrawn 25/06/1972
Time in Service 10 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1973
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 05/08/1961
41B Sheffield Darnall w/e 02/05/1964
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 25/12/1965
   Withdrawn 25/06/1972

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
05/08/1961 Power Unit 61B6    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/08/1961 To Service To service as D4073
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
02/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/06/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D4073    
01/02/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev