Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 782 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6387 Week
» 17934 Month
» 417616 Year
» 494203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4073   11/08/1923

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/08/1923 CAERPHILLY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 11/08/1923 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 10/05/1960 off Cardiff Canton (86C)
Service Life 36 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2210 08/1923 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1911 07/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1649 01/1926 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1852 31/12/1929 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2539 10/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2262 04/02/1931 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2415 07/12/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2615 07/09/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2400 02/04/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2630 09/06/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 01/08/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2628 09/08/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2415 17/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2667 17/11/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2613 02/04/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2389 01/01/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 23/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2854 31/05/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2803 27/01/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2844 27/01/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2710 23/01/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2819 13/11/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 11/08/1923
? (on loan) (British Empire Exhibition, Wembley) m/e 08/1924
PDN Old Oak Common 06/11/1924
CDF Cardiff Canton 04/03/1934
LDR Landore 02/10/1934
PDN Old Oak Common 06/04/1935
OXF Oxford 02/1939
PDN Old Oak Common 03/1939
SDN Swindon 21/04/1943
PDN Old Oak Common 07/1943
82A Bristol Bath Road 15/07/1950
82B St Philips Marsh 10/1952
82C Swindon 27/01/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 27/03/1953
86C Cardiff Canton 23/01/1957
   Withdrawn 10/05/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   10/05/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/08/1923 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4601)
30/01/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
13/12/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4614)
04/02/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4615)
07/09/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4651)
02/04/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4635)
17/11/1937 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4605)
17/04/1943 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6620)
02/04/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4601)
01/01/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6626)
10/06/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6675)
31/05/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4650)
27/01/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6600)
23/01/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6638)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 04/02/1924 14/02/1924 11 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 30/05/1925 17/07/1925 49 days Heavy
Tender number 1911 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
72507
Swindon Works 28/11/1925 06/02/1926 71 days Heavy
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1649 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
98849
Swindon Works 09/05/1927 11/08/1927 95 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/10/1928 18/12/1928 70 days Heavy
Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA)
269051
Swindon Works 22/10/1929 04/01/1930 75 days Light Repair
Tender number 1852 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/12/1930 07/02/1931 67 days General
Boiler number 4615 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2262 (Collett 3,500g) attached.
402678
Swindon Works 19/07/1932 17/09/1932 61 days General
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
489139
Swindon Works 16/01/1934 04/03/1934 48 days Intermediate 577784
Swindon Works 12/02/1935 06/04/1935 54 days General
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
643549
Swindon Works 27/04/1936 15/06/1936 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
725670
Swindon Works 12/02/1937 29/03/1937 46 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 04/10/1937 21/11/1937 49 days General
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
815977
Swindon Works 24/05/1939 07/08/1939 76 days Intermediate
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
914963
Swindon Works 31/05/1941 15/08/1941 77 days Intermediate
Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1010021
Swindon Works 12/03/1943 21/04/1943 41 days General
Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1093684
Swindon Works 27/09/1944 17/11/1944 52 days Intermediate
Tender number 2667 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1166934
Swindon Works 22/01/1946 02/04/1946 71 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1225637
Swindon Works 21/11/1947 01/01/1948 42 days General
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1316760
Swindon Works 06/05/1949 10/06/1949 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB)
1392396
Swindon Works 23/04/1951 31/05/1951 39 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2854 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1495223
Swindon Works 18/12/1952 27/01/1953 41 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2803 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1578131
Swindon Works 16/03/1953 27/03/1953 12 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 07/12/1954 27/01/1955 52 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2844 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1657336
Swindon Works 24/06/1955 02/08/1955 40 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 25/08/1956 23/01/1957 152 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6638 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2710 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1745776
Swindon Works 22/09/1958 13/11/1958 53 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1839896
Swindon Works 14/11/1958 01/12/1958 18 days Unclassified  
Caerphilly Works 23/09/1959 16/10/1959 24 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1923 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2210    
11/08/1923 To Service To service as GWR Number 4073, name: CAERPHILLY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
04/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1924. Dep: 14/02/1924.    
08/1924 Allocation      
06/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
30/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 17/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1911 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
28/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1649 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
09/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1927. Dep: 11/08/1927.    
10/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/10/1928. Dep: 18/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA)
   
22/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1852 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
10/1930 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2539    
03/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1930. Dep: 07/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4615 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2262 (Collett 3,500g) attached.
   
07/12/1931 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2415    
19/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1934. Dep: 04/03/1934.    
04/03/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
02/10/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
12/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/04/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
27/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1936. Dep: 15/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1937. Dep: 29/03/1937.    
04/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1937. Dep: 21/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
   
02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (OXF)    
03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
24/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1939. Dep: 07/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 15/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1943. Dep: 21/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6620 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
27/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 17/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2667 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1946. Dep: 02/04/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1947. Dep: 01/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/05/1949. Dep: 10/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB)
   
23/06/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2433    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
23/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2854 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/12/1952. Dep: 27/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2803 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
16/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 27/03/1953.    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
07/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/12/1954. Dep: 27/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2844 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1955. Dep: 02/08/1955.    
25/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/08/1956. Dep: 23/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6638 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2710 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
22/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1958. Dep: 01/12/1958.    
23/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Caerphilly Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959.    
10/05/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 4073 from Cardiff Canton (86C)    

prev prev