|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 11/02/1925 | 15/03/1925 | 33 days | Heavy | Tender number 2375 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached. |
65310 | |
Swindon Works | 10/10/1925 | 24/12/1925 | 76 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA) |
107538 | |
Swindon Works | 05/03/1926 | 03/04/1926 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 30/07/1926 | 04/08/1926 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 06/09/1926 | 14/09/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 20/06/1927 | 29/09/1927 | 102 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2035 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 10/09/1928 | 19/11/1928 | 71 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2232 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
250885 | |
Swindon Works | 05/12/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 28/01/1929 | 14/02/1929 | 18 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/05/1929 | 16/05/1929 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 30/01/1930 | 05/04/1930 | 66 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
327350 | |
Swindon Works | 08/07/1930 | 16/08/1930 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 14/09/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 83 days | Heavy | Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA) |
423921 | |
Swindon Works | 14/04/1932 | 03/05/1932 | 20 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2600 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 12/05/1932 | 27/05/1932 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 08/06/1932 | 24/06/1932 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 17/05/1933 | 07/1933 | Intermediate | ||||
Swindon Works | 03/07/1934 | 16/09/1934 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 4643 (Diagram HA) |
543986 | |
Swindon Works | 19/11/1935 | 19/01/1936 | 62 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
624225 | |
Swindon Works | 18/11/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 18/02/1937 | 24/02/1937 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 13/03/1937 | 28/03/1937 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 25/06/1937 | 29/08/1937 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 4616 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
712168 | |
Swindon Works | 11/03/1938 | 27/03/1938 | 17 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2448 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/10/1938 | 18/12/1938 | 55 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2711 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
796544 | |
Swindon Works | 22/08/1939 | 21/09/1939 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/02/1940 | 08/04/1940 | 60 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2716 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
873569 | |
Swindon Works | 28/08/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 66 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
950010 | |
Swindon Works | 21/06/1943 | 03/09/1943 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2587 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1032671 | |
Swindon Works | 28/09/1944 | 01/11/1944 | 35 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2395 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 07/11/1945 | 12/12/1945 | 36 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6680 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1140850 | |
Swindon Works | 16/07/1947 | 20/08/1947 | 36 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1221651 | |
Swindon Works | 17/01/1949 | 16/02/1949 | 31 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1290321 | |
Swindon Works | 27/10/1950 | 04/12/1950 | 39 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2680 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1379395 | |
Swindon Works | 08/01/1952 | 15/02/1952 | 39 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 30/06/1952 | 20/08/1952 | 52 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2424 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/09/1952 | 27/11/1952 | 73 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4628 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4063 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1448058 | |
Swindon Works | 18/03/1954 | 12/05/1954 | 56 days | Heavy Casual | Tender number 2532 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 28/03/1955 | 27/05/1955 | 61 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2927 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1545784 | |
Swindon Works | 19/12/1955 | 15/02/1956 | 59 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 29/01/1957 | 01/04/1957 | 63 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7648 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2724 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1620136 | |
Swindon Works | 20/02/1958 | 22/05/1958 | 92 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2931 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 23/01/1959 | 15/04/1959 | 83 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4111 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1696234 | |
Swindon Works | 22/07/1959 | 12/08/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 05/10/1959 | 30/10/1959 | 26 days | Unclassified | Tender number 4010 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 08/02/1961 | 19/04/1961 | 71 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7663 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1778123 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during November: 13, 28, 1003, 1785, 2189, 2202/39/91, 2669, 2741, 2854, 2921/34/81, 3004/44, 3183, 3366, 3435/43, 3638, 3775/98, 3802/4/13/4/7/38/57/65, 4000/16/53/74/82/95/8, 4272 4543, 4643/58, 4826, 4965/82; 5005/17/20/6, 5125/37, 5327/50/84, 5413, 5502/23, 5735/8/59/69, 5905/16/23/32/3/9/58/69, 6002/8, 6125/57, 6353/97; 6846, 6951/4, 7243, 7712/8/73/4/7/84, 8755, 9797. The advent of a K3 to Swindon works has been commented upon in the January Journal: it has a hole in its blast pipe, a bad regulator blow-through.and a hot box on one of the driving wheels. It may be recalled that B12/3 8539 was seen on the works turntable in 1944 when she was on loan to W.D. for working Ambulance Trains, but it is not known whether, on that occasion, she had entered the works or was merely using the turntable due to some defect of the one at the shed. The scale of withdrawals has been so great that the concentration yard has been overwhelmed, and some of the locos are stored in a road adjacent to the main line-2381/5, 2406, 1161, 3439, 2732/59 being noted- there on 21/12. Both latter engines had been dead at the home sheds for some time before their withdrawal. |
SLS/194602 |
31/07/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. | SLS/194709 |
31/01/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted |
SLS/194903 |
19/02/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. | SLS/196104 |
18/08/1963 | Swindon Works (Dump) | Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4074, name: CALDICOT CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Unallocated (n/a) Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g Diagram HA boiler fitted |
||
04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
11/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/02/1925. Dep: 15/03/1925. Work undertaken: Tender number 2375 (Collett 3,500g Intermediate) attached. |
||
10/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/10/1925. Dep: 24/12/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA) |
||
05/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/03/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926. | ||
30/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1926. Dep: 04/08/1926. | ||
06/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1926. Dep: 14/09/1926. | ||
20/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1927. Dep: 29/09/1927. Work undertaken: Tender number 2035 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
10/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/09/1928. Dep: 19/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2232 (Churchward 3,500g) attached. |
||
05/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. | ||
28/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/01/1929. Dep: 14/02/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1929. Dep: 16/05/1929. | ||
30/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 30/01/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1930. Dep: 16/08/1930. | ||
14/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/09/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA) |
||
12/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
14/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/04/1932. Dep: 03/05/1932. Work undertaken: Tender number 2600 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1932. Dep: 27/05/1932. | ||
27/05/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
08/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1932. Dep: 24/06/1932. | ||
24/06/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
17/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1933. Dep: ?/07/1933. | ||
07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
03/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1934. Dep: 16/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4643 (Diagram HA) |
||
16/09/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
19/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1935. Dep: 19/01/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. | ||
18/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1937. Dep: 24/02/1937. | ||
13/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 28/03/1937. | ||
28/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
25/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1937. Dep: 29/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4616 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/08/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
11/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1938. Dep: 27/03/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2448 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1938. Dep: 18/12/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2711 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1939. Dep: 21/09/1939. | ||
09/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1940. Dep: 08/04/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2716 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
26/04/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
28/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
21/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1943. Dep: 03/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6614 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2587 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1944. Dep: 01/11/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2395 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1945. Dep: 12/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6680 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) | ||
16/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/07/1947. Dep: 20/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/01/1949. Dep: 16/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/10/1950. Dep: 04/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2680 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1952. Dep: 15/02/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1952. Dep: 20/08/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2424 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/09/1952. Dep: 27/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4628 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4063 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2532 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1955. Dep: 27/05/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2927 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 15/02/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2835 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 01/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7648 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2724 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
06/1957 | Report | Report: No. 4074 has been modified with a double chimney and extended smokebox similarly to No. 4090. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
02/12/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2835 | ||
20/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 2931 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1959. Dep: 15/04/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 4111 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
13/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
22/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1959. Dep: 12/08/1959. | ||
12/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 30/10/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 4010 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
31/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (82C) | ||
08/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/02/1961. Dep: 19/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7663 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/01/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
19/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Didcot (81E) | ||
17/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
03/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4074 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
05/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |