Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 102 Today
» 924 Yesterday
» 3497 Week
» 19476 Month
» 214930 Year
» 1099311 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D4075 30/09/1961

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 30/09/1961
Withdrawn 11/06/1972
Time in Service 10 yrs, 8 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1973
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34E New England (New) 30/09/1961
40A Lincoln w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 11/06/1972

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
30/09/1961 Power Unit 61B157    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1961 To Service To service as D4075
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to New England (34E)
   
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
11/06/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D4075    
01/03/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev