Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 869 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6678 Week
» 13862 Month
» 321843 Year
» 1206224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4078   24/02/1924

Names Carried
Date From Name
24/02/1924 PEMBROKE CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 24/02/1924 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 02/07/1962 off Llanelly (87F)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2226 24/02/1924 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1939 05/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1949 05/1927 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2444 12/11/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2405 28/02/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 11/04/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2412 12/12/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2419 10/05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Dean 4,000g 1518 05/07/1935 GWR 4,000g
Collett 4,000g 2615 01/09/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2606 03/02/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2428 01/07/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 04/04/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2809 13/10/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2624 05/11/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2427 17/08/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2404 23/08/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2866 02/02/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2406 28/08/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2540 03/06/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2397 15/02/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4045 28/03/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2852 04/12/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2387 23/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 30/06/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4000 23/12/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 24/02/1924
CDF Cardiff Canton 23/04/1931
PDN Old Oak Common 17/12/1932
4A Shrewsbury 10/07/1935
LDR Landore 01/11/1935
84K Chester West 27/01/1958
81D Reading (W.R.) 15/06/1958
82A Bristol Bath Road 08/11/1958
84A Stafford Road 11/07/1959
84C Banbury 04/11/1959
81A Old Oak Common 04/04/1960
87F Llanelly 13/06/1961
   Withdrawn 02/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1961
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/02/1924 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
20/04/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4601)
28/08/1928 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
12/11/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4648)
10/05/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4633)
03/02/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4613)
17/08/1944 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6673)
02/02/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6643)
05/05/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6672)
15/02/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6683)
04/12/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6627)
23/09/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6682)
23/12/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6642)
31/12/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7624)
29/07/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7623)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 18/04/1925 02/06/1925 46 days Heavy
Tender number 1939 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
86052
Swindon Works 08/02/1926 23/04/1926 75 days Heavy
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
134536
Swindon Works 14/10/1926 24/12/1926 72 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/05/1927 31/05/1927 22 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 21/06/1928 01/09/1928 73 days Heavy
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
261154
Swindon Works 17/09/1929 18/11/1929 63 days Heavy
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2444 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
339055
Swindon Works 14/01/1930 08/03/1930 54 days Light Repair
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/02/1931 23/04/1931 63 days Heavy
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
424065
Swindon Works 26/08/1931 18/09/1931 24 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 05/10/1932 17/12/1932 74 days Intermediate
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
523770
Swindon Works 19/03/1934 17/05/1934 60 days General
Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
609175
Swindon Works 30/04/1935 10/07/1935 72 days Intermediate
Tender number 1518 (Dean 4,000g) attached.
689108
Swindon Works 21/07/1936 06/09/1936 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
768230
Swindon Works 06/11/1936 30/11/1936 25 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/01/1937 10/02/1937 22 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 30/08/1937 24/09/1937 26 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/12/1937 15/02/1938 71 days General
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
835148
Swindon Works 15/05/1939 10/07/1939 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
919993
Swindon Works 31/01/1941 10/04/1941 70 days Intermediate
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1004682
Swindon Works 03/09/1942 17/10/1942 45 days Intermediate
Tender number 2809 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1083423
Swindon Works 27/10/1942 07/11/1942 12 days Light Repair
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/06/1944 17/08/1944 56 days General
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1154558
Swindon Works 29/12/1945 02/02/1946 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2866 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1227084
Swindon Works 29/07/1946 28/08/1946 31 days Light Repair
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/03/1947 05/05/1947 38 days General
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
1281548
Swindon Works 07/01/1949 15/02/1949 40 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1365670
Swindon Works 27/02/1950 28/03/1950 30 days Light Casual
Tender number 4045 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/10/1950 04/12/1950 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6627 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1448228
Swindon Works 06/08/1952 23/09/1952 49 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2387 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1519111
Swindon Works 25/05/1954 30/06/1954 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1595537
Swindon Works 22/10/1955 23/12/1955 63 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1661758
Swindon Works 09/01/1956 30/01/1956 22 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 09/08/1957 31/12/1957 145 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7624 (Diagram HC)
1731533
Swindon Works 17/05/1960 29/07/1960 74 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7623 (Diagram HC)
1829470

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/02/1924 To Service To service as GWR Number 4078, name: PEMBROKE CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
18/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 02/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1939 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
08/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/02/1926. Dep: 23/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4601 (Diagram HA)
   
14/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1926. Dep: 24/12/1926.    
05/1927 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 1949    
10/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1927. Dep: 31/05/1927.    
21/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/06/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
   
17/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 18/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2444 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/02/1931. Dep: 23/04/1931.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
26/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1931. Dep: 18/09/1931.    
05/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/10/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
19/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1934. Dep: 17/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4633 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1935. Dep: 10/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1518 (Dean 4,000g) attached.
   
10/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
01/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
21/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/07/1936. Dep: 06/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1936. Dep: 30/11/1936.    
20/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1937. Dep: 10/02/1937.    
30/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1937. Dep: 24/09/1937.    
07/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1937. Dep: 15/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2606 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1939. Dep: 10/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1941. Dep: 10/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2809 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1944. Dep: 17/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/08/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2404    
29/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2866 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1946. Dep: 28/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 05/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
   
03/06/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2540    
07/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/01/1949. Dep: 15/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/02/1950. Dep: 28/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4045 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
30/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/10/1950. Dep: 04/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6627 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/08/1952. Dep: 23/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2387 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
09/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1956. Dep: 30/01/1956.    
09/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/08/1957. Dep: 31/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7624 (Diagram HC)
   
27/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
15/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
08/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
04/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
04/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
17/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1960. Dep: 29/07/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7623 (Diagram HC)
   
13/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
02/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 4078 from Llanelly (87F)    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev