Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 74 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4931 Week
» 16636 Month
» 348125 Year
» 424712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4079   04/03/1924

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/03/1924 PENDENNIS CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Thu 04/03/1924 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal During 05/1964 off St Philips Marsh (82B)
Service Life 40 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2227 02/1924 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2217 03/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Dean 4,000g 1457 11/1926 GWR 4,000g
Dean 4,000g 1513 05/1927 GWR 4,000g
Collett 4,000g 2417 20/03/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2542 28/03/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2244 04/09/1931 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2537 02/02/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 17/03/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2407 18/11/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2260 12/01/1935 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2540 24/05/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 08/04/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2624 19/01/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2590 18/06/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2682 17/10/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2778 16/07/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2630 10/04/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2828 01/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 04/02/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2405 21/09/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2895 11/04/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2589 06/07/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2864 22/10/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 20/06/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2663 17/02/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2416 08/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2908 23/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4120 30/11/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2910 31/03/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2658 29/06/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2653 30/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2846 21/06/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 17/09/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2559 29/09/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2390 20/10/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2913 08/05/1964 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 04/03/1924
? (on loan) (British Empire Exhibition, Wembley) 17/05/1925
LA Laira 13/04/1926
PDN Old Oak Common 25/06/1926
BRD Bristol Bath Road 11/09/1931
SRD Stafford Road 01/12/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton 14/12/1935
NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) 05/1937
CDF Cardiff Canton 06/1937
85 Gloucester Horton Road 01/11/1939
HFD Hereford 06/1944
85 Gloucester Horton Road 03/11/1948
84A Stafford Road 29/06/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 13/06/1957
83B Taunton 13/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh 18/01/1961
   Stored 14/03/1962
82C Swindon (Reinstated) 11/08/1962
82B St Philips Marsh 30/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 11/08/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 30/11/1963
WDN   14/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/03/1924 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4607)
04/05/1927 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4603)
28/03/1930 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4659)
04/09/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4604)
01/02/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4621)
24/05/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4634)
18/06/1938 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4635)
06/11/1944 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6612)
22/10/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6641)
17/02/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6671)
30/11/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6624)
15/09/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6671)
30/03/1954 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4624)
21/06/1955 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4608)
17/09/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6647)
28/11/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6686)
29/09/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6681)
20/10/1961 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6672)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 25/02/1925 23/03/1925 27 days Heavy
Tender number 2217 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
65669
Swindon Works 07/03/1927 10/05/1927 65 days Heavy
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached.
139104
Swindon Works 10/09/1927 29/10/1927 50 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/01/1929 23/03/1929 76 days Light Repair
Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/01/1930 31/03/1930 68 days Heavy
Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
309331
Swindon Works 25/06/1931 11/09/1931 79 days General
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2244 (Collett 3,500g) attached.
392525
Swindon Works 17/02/1932 17/03/1932 30 days Light Repair
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/05/1932 10/06/1932 30 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 27/09/1932 01/12/1932 66 days Intermediate
Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
464863
Swindon Works 03/04/1933 04/1933   Light Repair  
Swindon Works 28/11/1933 14/02/1934 79 days General
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
522135
Swindon Works 02/04/1935 29/05/1935 58 days General
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
597968
Swindon Works 28/07/1936 20/09/1936 55 days Intermediate 669928
Swindon Works 26/10/1936 12/11/1936 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/11/1936 30/11/1936 11 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 01/12/1937 13/02/1938 75 days Light Repair
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/04/1938 23/06/1938 78 days General
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2590 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
741476
Swindon Works 11/09/1939 01/11/1939 52 days Intermediate
Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
829372
Swindon Works 14/05/1941 18/07/1941 66 days Light Repair
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 17/02/1942 15/04/1942 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
904382
Swindon Works 28/02/1943 05/02/1944 343 days Light Repair
Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/09/1944 06/11/1944 47 days General
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
986556
Swindon Works 29/03/1946 10/05/1946 43 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 26/06/1946 06/07/1946 11 days Light Repair
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/09/1946 22/10/1946 35 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2864 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1056286
Swindon Works 27/05/1947 20/06/1947 25 days Light Repair
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 06/02/1948 10/03/1948 34 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 12/04/1948 23/04/1948 12 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/01/1949 17/02/1949 38 days Light Casual
Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2663 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/11/1949 17/02/1949 -256 days Heavy General 1140799
Swindon Works 01/11/1949 08/12/1949 38 days Heavy General
Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/10/1950 30/11/1950 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1221307
Swindon Works 11/08/1952 15/09/1952 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB)
1306158
Swindon Works 11/05/1953 29/06/1953 50 days Light Casual
Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 15/02/1954 30/03/1954 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1373850
Swindon Works 16/05/1955 21/06/1955 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1442193
Swindon Works 14/05/1956 19/09/1956 129 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1488699
Swindon Works 08/10/1957 28/11/1957 52 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB)
1545683
Swindon Works 31/07/1959 29/09/1959 61 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2559 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1632489
Swindon Works 25/08/1961 20/10/1961 57 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1720523

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1924 Tender Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g number 2227    
04/03/1924 To Service To service as GWR Number 4079, name: PENDENNIS CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
25/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/02/1925. Dep: 23/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2217 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
17/05/1925 Allocation      
13/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
25/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
11/1926 Tender Tender fitted: Dean 4,000g number 1457    
07/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/03/1927. Dep: 10/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 1513 (Dean 4,000g) attached.
   
10/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.    
07/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2417 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/01/1930. Dep: 31/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4659 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1931. Dep: 11/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2244 (Collett 3,500g) attached.
   
11/09/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
02/02/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2537    
17/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1932. Dep: 17/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/05/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932.    
27/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1932. Dep: 01/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2407 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
03/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1933. Dep: ?/04/1933.    
28/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1933. Dep: 14/02/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
   
12/01/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g number 2260    
02/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1935. Dep: 29/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
08/04/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2569    
28/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/07/1936. Dep: 20/09/1936.    
26/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1936. Dep: 12/11/1936.    
20/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1936. Dep: 30/11/1936.    
05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )    
06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
01/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1937. Dep: 13/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1938. Dep: 23/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4635 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2590 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/09/1939. Dep: 01/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
14/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/05/1941. Dep: 18/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/02/1942. Dep: 15/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/02/1943. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2410 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (HFD)    
21/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1944. Dep: 06/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/04/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2895    
29/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1946. Dep: 10/05/1946.    
26/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 22/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6641 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2864 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1948. Dep: 10/03/1948.    
12/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948.    
03/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85)    
11/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1949. Dep: 17/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2663 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 08/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 17/02/1949.    
23/01/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2908    
24/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/10/1950. Dep: 30/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4120 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
31/03/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2910    
11/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 15/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB)
   
11/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 29/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2658 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
15/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/02/1954. Dep: 30/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 21/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2846 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
08/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 28/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB)
   
31/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/07/1959. Dep: 29/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2559 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
18/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
25/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/08/1961. Dep: 20/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/03/1962 To Store To Store    
11/08/1962 Reinstated Reinstated to Swindon (82C)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4079 from St Philips Marsh (82B)    
08/05/1964 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2913    

prev prev