Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D408 22/03/1968
TOPS (Tops) 50008 01/01/1973

Names Carried
Name Date From
Thunderer 01/09/1978

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 50
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 22/03/1968
Withdrawn 05/06/1992
Withdrawal Reason Surplus to requirements
Time in Service 24 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 27/04/1993
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
WL Western Lines (LMR) (New) 22/03/1968
D05 Stoke Division 17/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 10/04/1976
LA Laira w/e 08/05/1976
   Withdrawn 05/06/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1968 To Service To service as D408
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)
   
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
27/12/1971 Sightings Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot RO 517 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 50008    
27/07/1975 Sightings At Crewe station - Running light    
10/04/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
08/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
01/09/1978 Naming Named 'Thunderer' at Laira    
05/06/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 50008    

prev prev