Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 720 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5294 Week
» 33252 Month
» 67894 Year
» 1289459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4080   23/03/1924

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/03/1924 POWDERHAM CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 23/03/1924 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 10/08/1964 off Southall (81C)
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Churchward 3,500g 2228 23/03/1924 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 1876 10/07/1925 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2418 23/03/1929 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2546 16/04/1930 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2441 29/05/1931 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2609 18/12/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2260 17/05/1935 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2568 06/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2430 29/06/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 10/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2390 26/02/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2735 20/01/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2425 18/01/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2604 20/12/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2698 06/11/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2712 17/02/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2836 23/12/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 01/01/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2576 04/09/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 16/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2431 12/09/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2850 12/02/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2745 22/01/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2416 30/06/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2737 18/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2708 07/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 02/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2428 02/08/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2745 09/01/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2618 19/05/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2754 22/11/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4068 10/02/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2808 15/08/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2613 08/04/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2922 30/10/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4083 13/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2926 14/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4082 19/01/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 23/03/1924
LA Laira 02/09/1926
NA Newton Abbot 03/08/1928
LA Laira 27/03/1929
NA Newton Abbot 26/04/1930
LA Laira 29/12/1932
NA Newton Abbot m/e 12/1933
PZ Penzance m/e 01/1935
LDR Landore 26/05/1935
LA Laira 09/01/1941
LDR Landore 23/12/1941
BRD Bristol Bath Road 09/11/1942
Brd Weston-super-Mare m/e 10/1943
BRD Bristol Bath Road 06/01/1944
Brd Weston-super-Mare m/e 08/1946
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 09/1946
NA Newton Abbot 07/01/1949
LA Laira m/e 06/1949
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 02/06/1950
82D Westbury 04/11/1950
83A Newton Abbot 19/05/1953
82A Bristol Bath Road 17/07/1954
83A Newton Abbot 13/05/1959
84G Shrewsbury 22/04/1960
86C Cardiff Canton 02/08/1960
88L Cardiff East Dock 07/09/1962
81A Old Oak Common 13/04/1964
81C Southall 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn 10/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NA Newton Abbot 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 82D Westbury 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 2w/e 13/04/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/03/1924 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4608)
27/08/1926 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4605)
23/03/1929 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4604)
29/05/1931 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4641)
21/12/1932 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4617)
17/05/1935 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4650)
23/12/1943 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6665)
12/09/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6640)
22/01/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4651)
30/06/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6623)
02/06/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6661)
09/01/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
19/05/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6669)
22/11/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6651)
15/08/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6685)
30/10/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6630)
13/08/1958 Double Chimney fitted
13/08/1958 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7676)
14/04/1960 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7675)
19/01/1962 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7647)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 06/06/1925 15/07/1925 40 days Heavy
Tender number 1876 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
67739
Swindon Works 26/05/1926 02/09/1926 100 days Heavy
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
121712
Swindon Works 15/10/1926 20/10/1926 6 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/06/1927 04/08/1927 41 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 21/05/1928 03/08/1928 75 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 17/01/1929 27/03/1929 70 days Heavy
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
264802
Swindon Works 20/02/1930 26/04/1930 66 days Heavy
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
332058
Swindon Works 13/04/1931 04/06/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
398401
Swindon Works 02/11/1932 29/12/1932 58 days General
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
492974
Swindon Works 25/10/1933 12/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 30/06/1934 12/07/1934 13 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 26/03/1935 26/05/1935 62 days General
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2260 (Collett 3,500g) attached.
635134
Swindon Works 20/05/1936 09/07/1936 51 days Intermediate
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
707665
Swindon Works 15/10/1936 15/11/1936 32 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/05/1937 14/06/1937 35 days Light Repair
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/01/1938 07/03/1938 56 days Intermediate
Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
787078
Swindon Works 25/04/1938 13/05/1938 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/06/1938 15/07/1938 33 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 28/11/1938 25/01/1939 59 days Light Repair
Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/11/1939 21/01/1940 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
868509
Swindon Works 28/10/1941 23/12/1941 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
953434
Swindon Works 08/10/1942 09/11/1942 33 days Light Repair
Tender number 2698 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/01/1943 23/02/1943 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 06/11/1943 06/01/1944 62 days General
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1032945
Swindon Works 24/07/1945 12/09/1945 51 days General
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1107181
Swindon Works 16/12/1946 22/01/1947 38 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1172129
Swindon Works 26/05/1948 30/06/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1237555
Swindon Works 22/12/1948 07/01/1949 17 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 16/08/1949 07/09/1949 23 days Light Casual
Tender number 2708 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 28/04/1950 02/06/1950 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1337922
Swindon Works 26/11/1951 09/01/1952 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1430781
Swindon Works 09/03/1953 19/05/1953 72 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1505347
Swindon Works 20/10/1954 22/11/1954 34 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6651 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1588215
Swindon Works 22/06/1956 15/08/1956 55 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2808 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1672742
Swindon Works 07/03/1957 08/04/1957 33 days Light Casual
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/08/1957 30/10/1957 84 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6630 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2922 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1727066
Swindon Works 18/04/1958 13/08/1958 118 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7676 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4083 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1758170
Swindon Works 26/02/1960 14/04/1960 49 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7675 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2926 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1838701
Swindon Works 21/11/1961 19/01/1962 60 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4082 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1923082

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/03/1924 To Service To service as GWR Number 4080, name: POWDERHAM CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Churchward 3,500g
Diagram HA boiler fitted
   
06/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/06/1925. Dep: 15/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 1876 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
   
26/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 26/05/1926. Dep: 02/09/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA)
   
02/09/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
15/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1926. Dep: 20/10/1926.    
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 04/08/1927.    
21/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1928. Dep: 03/08/1928.    
03/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
17/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/01/1929. Dep: 27/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2418 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
20/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/02/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
13/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1931. Dep: 04/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1932. Dep: 29/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
   
29/12/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
25/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1933. Dep: ?/12/1933.    
12/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
18/12/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2609    
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 12/07/1934.    
01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
26/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1935. Dep: 26/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2260 (Collett 3,500g) attached.
   
26/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
06/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2568    
20/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1936. Dep: 09/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2430 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1936. Dep: 15/11/1936.    
11/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1937. Dep: 14/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1938. Dep: 07/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2390 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1938. Dep: 13/05/1938.    
13/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1938. Dep: 15/07/1938.    
28/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1938. Dep: 25/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/11/1939. Dep: 21/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2425 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
28/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/10/1941. Dep: 23/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2604 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
08/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1942. Dep: 09/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2698 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
12/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 23/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
06/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 06/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
04/09/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2576    
16/12/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2433    
24/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1945. Dep: 12/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/02/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2850    
08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
16/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/12/1946. Dep: 22/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1948. Dep: 30/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1948. Dep: 07/01/1949.    
07/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
18/06/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2737    
16/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1949. Dep: 07/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2708 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/04/1950. Dep: 02/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6661 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Westbury (82D)    
02/08/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2428    
26/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 09/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 19/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2618 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
20/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/10/1954. Dep: 22/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6651 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2754 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/02/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4068    
22/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/06/1956. Dep: 15/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2808 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 08/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1957. Dep: 30/10/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6630 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2922 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/04/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7676 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4083 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
13/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
26/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1960. Dep: 14/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7675 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2926 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
02/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
21/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 19/01/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4082 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
07/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
10/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 4080 from Southall (81C)    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev