Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2014 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19817 Week
» 72833 Month
» 192360 Year
» 3219213 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1808 |
m/e |
10/1897 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9047 |
m/e |
02/1928 |
British Railways |
49047 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3813 |
To Service |
During 10/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/01/1958 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1897 |
6B |
|
Mold Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
5B |
|
Crewe South |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
5C |
|
Stafford |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/01/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/01/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1897 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1808 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3813 |
|
|
02/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9047 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49047 |
|
|
04/01/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49047 |
|
|