Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17800 Week
» 70816 Month
» 190343 Year
» 3217196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1833 |
m/e |
07/1898 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9009 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
49009 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
3838 |
To Service |
During 07/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/11/1959 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1898 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1833 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 3838 |
|
|
07/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9009 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plodder Lane (10D) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49009 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49009 |
|
|