Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2999 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16405 Week
» 69421 Month
» 188948 Year
» 3215801 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1876 |
m/e |
05/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9021 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
49021 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
A Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4030 |
To Service |
During 05/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1900 |
1A |
|
Willesden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
3A |
|
Bescot |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
06/12/1947 |
EXLOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
13/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
LOAN |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
EXLOAN |
3A |
Bescot |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Bescot MPD (21B) (Stored) |
Stored are 42421, 42940, 43963, 47296/363, 49021/77/99/126/275/343/411, 58119/204/283. Also possibly stored 40694 an 58122/3. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1900 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1876 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4030 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9021 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49021 |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49021 |
|
|