Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1037 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18840 Week
» 71856 Month
» 191383 Year
» 3218236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1884 |
m/e |
09/1901 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9266 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
British Railways |
49266 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4158 |
To Service |
During 09/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1901 |
3A |
|
Bescot |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
2C |
|
Warwick |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
24/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
02/10/1954 |
ALLOC |
2C |
Warwick |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1959 |
Rugby MPD |
For the first time since the middle of the War (when a Princess Royal was allocated) three named engines have been transferred here viz. Patriots 45533/7/41, all unrebuilt; they are being used on freight turns. Stanier 0-4-4Ts 41902/9 stored here since Warwick closed 11/58, were withdrawn w.e. 30th November. (Note that only 41900/4 now remain in stock as 41901/2/3/5/6/7/8/9 were withdrawn also on 30th November). Late items-41904 has now been withdrawn. It is understood that the Patriots have been allocated to assist, when necessary, the new diesels. The engines withdrawn on 28th Nov. were all still on shed on 13th Dec. viz. 40565/653/77/83, 41902/9, 49266/442 . |
SLS/196001 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1901 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1884 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4158 |
|
|
11/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9266 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49266 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49266 |
|
|