Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18133 Week
» 71149 Month
» 190676 Year
» 3217529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
826 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8905 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
British Railways |
48905 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4238 |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 06/06/1959 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 826 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4238 |
|
|
01/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8905 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bescot (3A) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48905 |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
06/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48905 |
|
|