Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1106 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20017 Week
» 84971 Month
» 287635 Year
» 3314488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2074 |
m/e |
05/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8908 |
m/e |
10/1923 |
British Railways |
48908 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4248 |
To Service |
During 05/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/09/1950 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
EXLOAN |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
07/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
2C |
Northampton |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Coventry |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/09/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1945 |
Belle Vue MPD |
Locos seen during October included: 1097 22B, 3173 20G, 6272 22A, 5303 8A, 5364 12A, 5590 22A, 8908 5B, 9029 10A, 12336 23E, 12562 24D, 12857 23B, 12861 23B. 8037 18A was noted on a troop train on 4/10. |
SLS/194601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2074 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4248 |
|
|
10/1923 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8908 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48908 |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coventry (2F) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48908 |
|
|