Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 844 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14250 Week
» 67266 Month
» 186793 Year
» 3213646 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
2559 |
m/e |
08/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8914 |
m/e |
11/1927 |
British Railways |
48914 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4258 |
To Service |
During 08/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 13/07/1957 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1902 |
2C |
|
Northampton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2A |
|
Rugby |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
13/07/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/07/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 2559 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4258 |
|
|
11/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8914 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48914 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48914 |
|
|