Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 578 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18381 Week
» 71397 Month
» 190924 Year
» 3217777 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1055 |
m/e |
11/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9377 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
British Railways |
49377 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4283 |
To Service |
During 11/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/10/1962 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1055 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4283 |
|
|
02/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9377 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
27/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49377 |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
28/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
27/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49377 |
|
|