Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 824 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14230 Week
» 67246 Month
» 186773 Year
» 3213626 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1070 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9120 |
m/e |
09/1927 |
British Railways |
49120 |
m/e |
09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4298 |
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/09/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
2C |
Warwick |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
2B |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
02/10/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1070 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4298 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9120 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
09/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49120 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warwick (2C) |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49120 |
|
|