Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 804 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18607 Week
» 71623 Month
» 191150 Year
» 3218003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1272 |
m/e |
05/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8932 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
48932 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4325 |
To Service |
During 05/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1272 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4325 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8932 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48932 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48932 |
|
|