Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15658 Week
» 68674 Month
» 188201 Year
» 3215054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1285 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9339 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
49339 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4357 |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/12/1954 |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1285 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4357 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9339 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49339 |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
17/07/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49339 |
|
|