Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14835 Week
» 67851 Month
» 187378 Year
» 3214231 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1288 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8943 |
m/e |
07/1928 |
British Railways |
48943 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4360 |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/09/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
ALLOC |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
5C |
Stafford |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1288 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4360 |
|
|
07/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8943 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48943 |
|
|
28/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48943 |
|
|