Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 856 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18659 Week
» 71675 Month
» 191202 Year
» 3218055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
918 |
m/e |
02/1904 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8948 |
m/e |
05/1927 |
British Railways |
48948 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Webb |
Class |
4 Cylinder Compound |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4392 |
To Service |
During 02/1904 |
Withdrawal |
4w/e Sat 16/07/1949 off Abergavenny (4D) |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works (Scrap Road) |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 918 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4392 |
|
|
05/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8948 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 48948 but not taken up |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8948 from Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|