Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 23 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17826 Week
» 70842 Month
» 190369 Year
» 3217222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1639 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9115 |
m/e |
08/1928 |
British Railways |
49115 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Whale |
Class |
2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
4925 |
To Service |
During 06/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/11/1959 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1910 |
6B |
|
Mold Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1948 |
Crewe Works |
The last two Class '5' 4-6-0's of Order E467 (Nos. 4766 and 4767 ) were completed on 17/12 and 30/12 respectively. The latter engine is fitted with outside Stephenson's valve gear and both engines are equipped with electric lighting. The latest 'Royal Scot' conversion is No. 6162 , which was completed on 19/12. No. 6154 is the next to be dealt with. The next 'Pacific' No. 6257 (No. 5 of Order E464) is rapidly taking shape together with the first Class '5' 4-6-0 under Order E468 (ten engines), No. 4748; this batch are all to be fitted with Caprotti valve gear and roller bearings. The L.M.S. lettering has already started to disappear from both tank and tender sides, but so far, locomotives receiving a general repair are still being repainted in the new standard livery. A recent interesting visitor to the Works was ex L.N.W.R. 4-6-0 No. 8824, which received a service repair. More ex L.N.W.R. locomotives have gone to the scrap-heap; they were cut up as follows: (W/E 20/12) 7944, 25845; (W/E 27/12) 6725, 9380; (W/E 3/1) 9215, 27663; (W/E 10/1) 9115, 28401; (W/E 17/1) 25694. |
SLS/194802 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1639 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 4925 |
|
|
08/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9115 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49115 |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49115 |
|
|