Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
215 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9397 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49397 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1921 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
8C |
|
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 215 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9397 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49397 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49397 |
|
|