Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1900 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19703 Week
» 72719 Month
» 192246 Year
» 3219099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
220 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9399 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
British Railways |
49399 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1921 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2C |
|
Northampton |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2C |
Northampton |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 220 |
|
|
06/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9399 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northampton (2C) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49399 |
|
|
13/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49399 |
|
|