Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3664 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22575 Week
» 87529 Month
» 290193 Year
» 3317046 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
1154 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9403 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
British Railways |
49403 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/06/1962 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 1154 |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9403 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49403 |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
02/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
02/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49403 |
|
|