Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 828 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3388 Week
» 16421 Month
» 238822 Year
» 1123203 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 1154 m/e 11/1921
LMS 9403 m/e 03/1926
BR 49403 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/06/1962
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
4D Abergavenny 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 04/12/1954
1E Bletchley 4w/e 22/03/1958
9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 02/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 02/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as LNWR Number 1154    
03/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 9403    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Abergavenny (4D)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49403    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
02/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 49403    

prev prev