Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1883 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15289 Week
» 68305 Month
» 187832 Year
» 3214685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
223 |
m/e |
11/1921 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9404 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
British Railways |
49404 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 11/1921 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/04/1962 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1921 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
11/10/1947 |
EXLOAN |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
25/10/1947 |
ALLOC |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1921 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 223 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9404 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49404 |
|
|
19/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
28/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49404 |
|
|