Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14173 Week
» 67189 Month
» 186716 Year
» 3213569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
367 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9405 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
British Railways |
49405 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/12/1952 |
Northwich MPD |
It was confirmed, when this shed was visited on the shortest day of the year, that 45 locomotives are housed there. Among these are a dozen '8F's'; eight 'J.10's' and five 'D.10's.' For working the heavily graded Winnington mineral branch, only one L.3 2-6-4 tank remains (69052); it is assisted on similar duties by two recently drafted 'Super-D' 0-8-0's (49405 and 49435). Both the latter have been fitted with tender cabs for backward running. The remaining locomotives at Northwich comprise a number of 'standard class 4' 0-6-0's; one D.11 and one or two other oddments. |
SLS/195302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 367 |
|
|
02/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9405 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49405 |
|
|
08/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (9G) |
|
|
31/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49405 |
|
|