Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 145 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4386 Week
» 17419 Month
» 239820 Year
» 1124201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNWR 411 m/e 01/1922
LMS 9411 m/e 08/1927
BR 49411 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Beames
Class G2
Company History LNWR/LMS
Wheels 0-8-0
To Service During 01/1922
Withdrawal w/e Sat 14/10/1961
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
8B Warrington Dallam 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2D Coventry 8w/e 19/06/1954
3B Bushbury 4w/e 25/01/1958
3A Bescot w/e 24/10/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 14/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1922 To Service To service as LNWR Number 411    
08/1927 Renumbered Renumbered to 9411    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 49411    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Coventry (2D)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
24/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 49411    

prev prev