Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19968 Week
» 72984 Month
» 192511 Year
» 3219364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
417 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9412 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
British Railways |
49412 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1922 |
2D |
|
Nuneaton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
RA |
|
|
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
8A |
|
Edge Hill |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RA |
|
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 417 |
|
|
12/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9412 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49412 |
|
|
03/06/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49412 |
|
|