Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2991 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16397 Week
» 69413 Month
» 188940 Year
» 3215793 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
429 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9413 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
British Railways |
49413 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/10/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1922 |
2A |
|
Rugby |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
1A |
|
Willesden |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
08/03/1947 |
ALLOC |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 429 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9413 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rugby (2A) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49413 |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49413 |
|
|