Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17304 Week
» 70320 Month
» 189847 Year
» 3216700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
574 |
m/e |
03/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9422 |
m/e |
08/1927 |
British Railways |
49422 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 03/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/09/1961 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
ALLOC |
4D |
Abergavenny |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
ALLOC |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 574 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9422 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (2B) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49422 |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49422 |
|
|