Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18097 Week
» 71113 Month
» 190640 Year
» 3217493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
576 |
m/e |
03/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9424 |
m/e |
04/1927 |
British Railways |
49424 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 03/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 07/11/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/01/1958 |
Shrewsbury MPD |
The following locomotives are in store here-43760, 49243/60/424 and WD's 90148/716. |
SLS/195803 |
21/06/1958 |
Burton MPD |
49424, ex-store at Tutbury, was transferred here 21st June. |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 576 |
|
|
04/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9424 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49424 |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49424 |
|
|