Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1454 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14860 Week
» 67876 Month
» 187403 Year
» 3214256 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Western Railway |
869 |
m/e |
07/1922 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
9426 |
m/e |
07/1927 |
British Railways |
49426 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Beames |
Class |
G2 |
Company History |
LNWR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-8-0 |
To Service |
During 07/1922 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/09/1962 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1922 |
2C |
|
Northampton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
2A |
|
Rugby |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
10C |
|
Patricroft |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1922 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Western Railway Number 869 |
|
|
07/1927 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9426 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northampton (2C) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 49426 |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (10C) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 49426 |
|
|